MD SB82 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $20,000 to $30,000 the maximum amount payable from the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund for specified claims on account of injury to or death of one individual arising from a motor vehicle accident; increasing from $40,000 to $60,000 the maximum amount payable from the Fund for specified claims on account of injury to or death of more than one individual arising from a motor vehicle accident; providing for the allocation of penalties among specified funds on or after a specified date; etc.
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Claims for Bodily Injury or Death -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (98-24) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2012-04-02 | Motion Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate Barkley) Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Barkley) Adopted | |
2012-03-31 | Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 833998/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (42-4) | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments 827673/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Finance |