MD SB82 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a Maryland corporation, a limited liability partnership, a limited partnership, and a Maryland statutory trust to have a resident agent, rather than at least one resident agent; and altering the circumstances that determine when a resignation of a resident agent for certain business entities is effective.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies
Residency
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies
Residency
Work, Labor and Employment