MD SB82 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certified nursing assistant to meet certain federal requirements and pass a competency exam on or after October 1, 2023; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a program to assist certified nursing assistants in meeting licensing requirements established by the Act.
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants - Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Education
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Time
Committees and Commissions
Education
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1410.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |