MD SB828 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified ad valorem and special taxes imposed only within a special taxing district for the purpose of financing the cost of State and county transportation improvements from county tax limitations; authorizing a county to issue, by law, specified bonds for specified infrastructure improvements; etc.
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements - Exemption from County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (107-29) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (43-3) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Bonds
Counties
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Property Tax
Public Debt
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Transportation
Counties
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Mass Transit
Property Tax
Public Debt
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Transportation