MD SB828 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Planning to make a recommendation and provide notice regarding real property at the former Crownsville Hospital Center; and requiring that the Department, as its first option, commence negotiations with specified veterans organizations in Anne Arundel County to use the property to establish an Anne Arundel County veterans center.
Title
Disposition of Excess State Property - Former Crownsville Hospital Center
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Community Facilities and Services
Notices
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
State Hospitals
Veterans
Community Facilities and Services
Notices
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
State Hospitals
Veterans
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0828.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0828f.pdf |