MD SB828 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program by clarifying and altering certain provisions relating to the administration of the Program; establishing the employer and employee shares of the total rate of contribution; prohibiting the total rate of contribution from exceeding 1.2% of an employee's wage; requiring the State to pay for certain contributions for certain covered employees; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to reimburse certain community providers for certain employer contributions in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-36) |
2023-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713426/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-13) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823826/1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB988 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Age
Claims
Data
Disabilities
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Foster Care
Health
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Leave
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Signatures
Substance Abuse
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Age
Claims
Data
Disabilities
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Foster Care
Health
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Leave
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Signatures
Substance Abuse
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8.3 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8.3 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 8.3 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |