MD SB830 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a limited license to provide hair services - blow drying; requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists to establish by regulation specified curriculum standards for providing hair services - blow drying for use by specified entities for a specified purpose; establishing qualifications for a limited license to provide hair services - blow drying; providing that a specified limited license authorizes the licensee to provide only specified services; etc.
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hair Services - Blow Drying
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844131/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |