MD SB844 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Hearing 3/11 at 8:00 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Hearing 3/11 at 8:00 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified members of the Employees' Pension System may transfer specified service credit from the State Contributory Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System in a specified manner; requiring that specified members of the Employees' Pension System who transfer service credit complete and file certain forms with the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System on or before December 31, 2011; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Transfer of Service Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-03-10 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2011-02-14 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0844.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0844f.pdf |