MD SB844 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual who holds a Deer Management Permit to use a specified rifle to harvest deer throughout the year in Frederick County, subject to specified conditions; authorizing an agent of a permittee in a specified zone in Frederick County to use a specified rifle to harvest deer in the County throughout the year; authorizing an agent of a permittee in a specified zone in Frederick County to use a rifle to harvest deer during a specified period with a specified exception; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {194930/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Animals
Boundaries
Frederick County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Weapons
Boundaries
Frederick County
Guns
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Weapons