MD SB852 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of festivals that a holder of a beer and wine festival license may hold in Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Anne Arundel County Board of License Commissioners to issue a specified beer and wine festival license to specified nonprofit organizations under specified circumstances; and providing that, notwithstanding specified other provisions of law, a specified license holder may display and sell beer and wine at a specified beer and wine festival without holding specified permits.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fairs
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Retail Sales