MD SB853 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law subjecting specified individuals convicted of specified felonies involving a controlled dangerous substance who apply for temporary cash assistance or food stamps to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; altering the criminal violations that make specified recipients ineligible for temporary cash assistance or food stamps for 1 year after conviction and subject to specified testing and treatment requirements and sanctions; etc.
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-51) (Y: 85 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {393120/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {393120/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (85-51) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment {393120/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-32) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Brochin) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Ex-Offenders
Food Stamps
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Parole and Probation
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
Welfare
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Ex-Offenders
Food Stamps
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Parole and Probation
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
Welfare