MD SB86 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a certain provision of law may not be construed to authorize the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility or while an offender is in a home detention program; authorizing the imposition of certain penalties for the possession of marijuana or cannabis on the grounds of a local correctional facility and while an offender is in a home detention program; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of Medical Cannabis - Local Correctional Facilities and Home Detention Program - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-11-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback