MD SB872 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program to award competitive grants to institutions of higher education to develop and implement programs that provide inclusive higher education opportunities for students with intellectual and developmental disabilities; requiring the Program to be administered by the Maryland Higher Education Commission, in consultation with specified entities; requiring the Commission to submit an annual report on the program's effectiveness beginning June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
James W. Hubbard Inclusive Higher Education Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-16) (Y: 124 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-16) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {394932/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disabled
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
Appropriations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disabled
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports