MD SB875 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a secured party from obtaining a deficiency judgment or taking any other action to collect a deficiency in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on owner-occupied residential property that was recorded on or after October 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |