MD SB877 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotate Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |