MD SB879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a restriction on the harvesting of shellfish between the hours of sunset and sunrise from certain areas leased for aquaculture; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation the hours for harvesting shellfish within leased areas.
Title
Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Sen. Dawn Gile [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB857 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-29 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Aquaculture
Clams
Committees and Commissions
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Time
Clams
Committees and Commissions
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |