MD SB884 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law relating to the designation of the exclusive representative for specified public school employees in Baltimore County; repealing provisions of law that authorized Baltimore County to designate as a separate bargaining unit only specified registered nurses in specified schools in the county; prohibiting more than two bargaining units in Baltimore County and requiring each unit to consist of specified employees; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Bargaining Unit for Public School Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (122-18) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (40-4) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Nurses
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Nurses
Public Employees
Public Schools
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment