MD SB884 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Department of Transportation to use the maximum feasible amount of specified federal funds available for a highway or capital transit construction training program and supportive services, including skill improvement programs; requiring the Department to administer specified programs in collaboration with the Governor's Workforce Investment Board; requiring the Department and the Board to submit a specified report by February 1 each year to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Transportation - Highway or Capital Transit Construction Training and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (37-7) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) 873923/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 887078/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing cancelled (Finance) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance & Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contractors
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Job Training
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Construction
Contractors
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Job Training
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment