MD SB912 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to focus on certain individuals in the near completer communication campaign for certain academic years; requiring the Commission to use a certain annual family income determination when awarding a Guaranteed Access Grant; providing that a recipient of a Guaranteed Access Grant who becomes ineligible due to a family income change shall remain eligible for the full award term if a certain condition is met; authorizing a private career school to award certain scholarships; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - Alterations and Appropriation (Maryland Student Investment Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {673723/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB734 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
COVID-19
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
pandemics
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Veterans
Budgets
COVID-19
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
pandemics
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 2503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |