MD SB915 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the regulatory approach for controlling invasive plant species in the State, including repealing certain provisions of law relating to a two-tiered regulatory approach and requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a list of prohibited invasive plants by regulation in a certain manner on or before October 1, 2024; establishing certain protocols for assessing certain nonnative plants and determining whether those plants are invasive or whether the plants may be placed on a certain watch list; etc.
Title
Agriculture – Invasive Plant Species – Regulation (Biodiversity and Agriculture Protection Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-31) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {543621/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743320/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB979 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Highways
Independent Contractors
Invasive Species
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
plants
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
State Universities and Colleges
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Environmental Matters
Examinations
Highways
Independent Contractors
Invasive Species
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
plants
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
State Universities and Colleges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 301.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 5 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |