MD SB921 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an appointed member of the Frederick County Board of Zoning Appeals, the Frederick County Ethics Commission, the Frederick County Planning Commission, or the Board of License Commissioners of Frederick County or a person acting on behalf of the member, a campaign finance entity of the member, or any other campaign finance entity operated in coordination with the member from soliciting, receiving, depositing, or using a contribution while the member is serving on the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-04-01HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Ways and Means and Economic Matters
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {994231/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback