MD SB931 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to the designation of a harvest reserve area for oysters; repealing specified provisions of law relating to county oyster committees and a statewide committee of oystermen; requiring the licensed oyster harvesters of each tidewater county to elect a county commercial oyster committee; providing for the composition and chair of a county commercial oyster committee; requiring a county commercial oyster committee to establish a specified sustainable oyster harvest plan; etc.
Title
Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Eckardt) Adopted |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters