MD SB938 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the assessment of a fee by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission for funding the Hospital Employees Retraining Fund is to be in the case of a hospital closure, merger, or full delicensure; altering the circumstances under which hospitals are required to pay a certain fee directly to the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring certain hospitals to pay a direct remittance based on total annual revenue by July 1 each year; requiring that certain money be returned to certain hospitals under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167875/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 326.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |