MD SB943 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 25% to 30% the percentage of the earned income credit allowable for the taxable year under ยง 32 of the Internal Revenue Code that determines the amount an individual may claim as an income tax refund under specified circumstances; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2011; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Refundable Earned Income Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-13 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0943.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0943f.pdf |