MD SB944 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition against the sale of nonlatex condoms through a vending machine or other automatic device; prohibiting the sale of natural membrane condoms through a vending machine or other automatic device; and authorizing registered nurses to provide, without a prescription, nonprescription drugs and devices in a local health department under certain circumstances.
Title
Nonprescription Drugs and Devices - Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-16) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933623/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {613429/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1171 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Birth Control
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Health Occupations
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Reproductive Matters
Vending Machines
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Health Occupations
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences
Reproductive Matters
Vending Machines
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |