MD SB957 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that any funds or portion of the funds remaining in a special taxing district established in Calvert County at the termination of the special taxing district may be applied to a future special taxing district created for the same subdivision, returned to owners of property in the special taxing district, or applied to a special taxing district reserve fund as agreed to by the County Commissioners and the homeowners association that petitioned for the creation of the special taxing district; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Special Taxing Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-3) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-29 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-25 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Calvert County
County Commissioners
Homeowners Associations
Property Tax
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
County Commissioners
Homeowners Associations
Property Tax
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits