MD SB975 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program in the Maryland Department of Health to assist reproductive health care clinics in the State with costs associated with security improvements and safety operational expenses; prohibiting the Department from disclosing certain personal information of an individual associated with the Program; and authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2026 an appropriation of $500,000 to the Program.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Reproductive Health Care Clinic Security Grant Program - Establishment (Supporting Reproductive Health Care Clinics Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Floor Amendment 363426/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Floor Amendment 363426/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-35) |
2024-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {363426/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (37-96) |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {473629/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment {153922/1 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Beidle) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Kelly) Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1091 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-26 - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Budgets
Clinics
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Governor
Grants
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Security Alarms
Standards and Best Practices
Clinics
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Governor
Grants
Health
Health, Department of
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Security Alarms
Standards and Best Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |