MD SB984 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor tasting license in Ward 27, Precinct 48 of the 43rd Legislative District of Baltimore City.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of