MD SB988 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which certain entities are required to provide coverage for certain expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-29) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {397173/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB781 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 324
Subjects
Discrimination
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Reproductive Matters
Spouses
Women
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Reproductive Matters
Spouses
Women