MD SB991 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from purchasing, selling, offering for sale, or possessing with the intent to sell specified parts or products of specified animal species under specified circumstances, subject to specified exceptions; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring that fines and restitution imposed under the Act be credited to the Department of Natural Resources for the benefit of the Birdwatcher's Fund to be used for the preservation of nongame wildlife species and threatened or endangered species; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Animals
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Birds
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Fines
Hunting and Fishing
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Birds
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Fines
Hunting and Fishing
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Witnesses