MD SB998 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of Motor Vehicle Administration records containing personal information to disclose specified personal information related to plug-in vehicles for specified use by an electric company subject to specified restrictions.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Plug-In Vehicles - Disclosure of Personal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (106-30) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-02 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-30 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (37-10) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Senate Rules |