MD SB998 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class BWLT beer, wine, and liquor (on premises) tasting license in a specified portion of the 43rd legislative district of Baltimore City.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of