ME LD1013 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide Training, Professional Development and Wellness Supports for Child Protective Services Workers
Title
An Act to Provide Training, Professional Development and Wellness Supports for Child Protective Services Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |