ME LD1104 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify the State's Commitments Concerning Certain Public Service Retirement Benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify the State's Commitments Concerning Certain Public Service Retirement Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-05-14SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-08SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-08SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-205), in concurrence.
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-205) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-08SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-08SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-205).
2019-05-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-07HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-03-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-03-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-03-05HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback