ME LD1117 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study the Phase-out of Subminimum Wage
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study the Phase-out of Subminimum Wage
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Jennifer Parker [D] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] |
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Scott Hamann [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #219 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-190). |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2017-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-190). |
2017-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-190) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 219 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to Table Same Senator asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her motion |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 219 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |