ME LD1148 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prohibit COVID-19 Vaccine Mandates for Students Enrolled in Public Institutions of Learning
Title
An Act to Prohibit COVID-19 Vaccine Mandates for Students Enrolled in Public Institutions of Learning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #57 (Y: 78 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #122 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #122 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-05-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 57 (Yeas 78 - Nays 64 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-05-09 | House | On motion of Representative MILLETT of Cape Elizabeth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 122 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report . |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senator RAFFERTY of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report . |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |