ME LD1169 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Accountability in State Contracts
Title
An Act To Ensure Accountability in State Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Colleen Lachowicz [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Edward Mazurek [D] |
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #134 (Y: 64 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #98 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #98 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-06-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-06-05 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-67) and ASKED FOR A COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-05-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-28 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 134 (Yeas 64 - Nays 76 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-67). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-67) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-05-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-05-22 | Senate | (18 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Roll Call Number 98 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |