ME LD1231 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 716 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 716 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Bring Fairness in Income Taxes to Maine Families by Adjusting the Tax Brackets
Title
An Act to Bring Fairness in Income Taxes to Maine Families by Adjusting the Tax Brackets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Enactment RC #716 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #680 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #469 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #680 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #469 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 716 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BENNETT of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-924) in concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-924) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 680 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-924) Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-924). |
2024-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-924) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 469 (Yeas 88 - Nays 57 - Absent 5 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2024-02-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |