ME LD1269 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Laws Regarding Significant Groundwater Wells
Title
An Act To Clarify the Laws Regarding Significant Groundwater Wells
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-340) in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-340) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-340) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Goodall of Sagadahoc, REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Committee on Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |