ME LD1269 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Adjust the Procedure for Recounts in Certain Municipal Elections
Title
An Act To Adjust the Procedure for Recounts in Certain Municipal Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-243), in concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-243) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-243). |
2017-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2017-04-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-04-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-04-06 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |