ME LD1273 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create a License Plate To Recognize the Bicentennial of the State
Title
Resolve, To Create a License Plate To Recognize the Bicentennial of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-26 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-05-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-20 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-99). |
2015-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) . |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-07 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION |