ME LD1385 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Reporting Requirements of the Workers' Compensation Management Fund
Title
An Act To Amend the Reporting Requirements of the Workers' Compensation Management Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-01-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-01-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2014-01-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cain of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2013-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |