ME LD1432 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase the Inclusion of Demographic Data from State Agencies in the Legislative Process
Title
An Act to Increase the Inclusion of Demographic Data from State Agencies in the Legislative Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #451 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-889) in concurrence |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-889) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-889). |
2024-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-889) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 451 (Yeas 81 - Nays 66 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative STOVER of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |