ME LD1447 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Recognize and Provide for the Right of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Operate a Casino on Houlton Band Trust Land Exempt from Certain Gaming Laws
Title
An Act To Recognize and Provide for the Right of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Operate a Casino on Houlton Band Trust Land Exempt from Certain Gaming Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #339 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #327 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #295 (Y: 74 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #327 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #295 (Y: 74 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 339 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-437). |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Number 327 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator COLLINS of York to ACCEPT The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE Roll Call Ordered |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senator COLLINS of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | Subsequently, The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-437). |
2017-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-437) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 295 (Yeas 74 - Nays 70 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |