ME LD1457 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Pending: Joint Appropriations And Financial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Pending: Joint Appropriations And Financial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for a Jail in Caribou
Title
An Act to Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for a Jail in Caribou
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Roger Albert [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Rep. Timothy Guerrette [R] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1457&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0575&item=1&snum=131 |