ME LD1511 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for the Protection of Public Health and Marine Resources and To Achieve Cost Savings in State Facilities Owned by the Department of Marine Resources
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue for the Protection of Public Health and Marine Resources and To Achieve Cost Savings in State Facilities Owned by the Department of Marine Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1511&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1035&item=1&snum=128 |