ME LD1628 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Reform the Occupational Licensing Regime by Including Portability and Removing Good Character Requirements
Title
An Act to Reform the Occupational Licensing Regime by Including Portability and Removing Good Character Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Sally Cluchey [D] | Rep. Benjamin Hymes [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1628&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0645&item=1&snum=131 |