ME LD1645 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the Maine Community College System, the University of Maine System and the Maine Maritime Academy To Report the Number of Students Enrolled in Remedial Courses
Title
An Act To Require the Maine Community College System, the University of Maine System and the Maine Maritime Academy To Report the Number of Students Enrolled in Remedial Courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-475). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-475) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) On motion of Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-475). | |
2012-03-27 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-475) READ and ADOPTED . | |
2012-03-27 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-475) Report ACCEPTED . | |
2012-03-27 | (S) Reports READ. | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2011 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |