ME LD1650 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Recommendations of the Study of the Allocations of the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Title
An Act To Enact the Recommendations of the Study of the Allocations of the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #590 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-04 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #555 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #555 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | LD 1650 In Senate, April 5, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 16 in Favor and 18 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2016-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-04 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 555V 129 having voted in the affirmative and 13 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-04 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ TWICE PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-03-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-15 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-15 | House | Reported by Representative GATTINE for the Joint Standing Committee on Health and Human Services pursuant to Joint Rule 353. |