ME LD1671 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Motorized Recreational Gold Prospecting in Class AA Waters and Certain Atlantic Salmon and Brook Trout Habitats
Title
An Act To Prohibit Motorized Recreational Gold Prospecting in Class AA Waters and Certain Atlantic Salmon and Brook Trout Habitats
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #682 (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #559 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #565 (Y: 117 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #459 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #559 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #565 (Y: 117 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #459 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 682V 119 having voted in the affirmative and 23 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2014-04-08 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-08 | Senate | LD 1671 In Senate, April 8, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 in the affirmative and 0 in the Negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-03-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 565 (Yeas 117 - Nays 25 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-25 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-25 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-424). |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 459 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |